House | 03/14/2022 | See HB 5001 (line item 101) | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/02/2021 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 12/02/2021 | Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/02/2021 | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/23/2021 | Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda | ||
House | 11/18/2021 | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/18/2021 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 11/18/2021 | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/08/2021 | Filed |