Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Received | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | In Messages | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Immediately certified | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Requests that the Senate pass the bill as passed by the House or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | CS passed; YEAS 97, NAYS 20 | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2022) | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | CS Filed | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Reported out of Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Filed |