Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H6037 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 24, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2022

Analysis

Analysis June 1, 2022
Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022
Analysis October 21, 2021
Analysis October 14, 2021