House
|
03/07/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 70
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2021
|
Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2021
|
Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/01/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|