Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H6509 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 02/17/2022

                                
   
CS/HB 6509  	2022 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb6509-01-c1 
Page 1 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
A bill to be entitled 1 
An act for the relief of Donna Catalano by the 2 
Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; 3 
providing an appropriation to compensate Donna 4 
Catalano for injuries and damages sustained as a 5 
result of the negligence of Donald Gerard Burthe, an 6 
employee of the Department of Agriculture and Consumer 7 
Services; providing a limitation on the payment of 8 
certain fees, costs, and other expenses; providi ng an 9 
effective date. 10 
 11 
 WHEREAS, on June 26, 2019, Donald Gerard Burthe, an 12 
employee of the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services, 13 
while operating a department vehicle during his employment, was 14 
traveling west on U.S. Highway 90, and 15 
 WHEREAS, Donna Catalano, returning home after completing 16 
her nursing shift at Tallahassee Memorial HealthCare, was 17 
traveling east on U.S. Highway 90, and 18 
 WHEREAS, Mr. Burthe failed to maintain his lane of travel 19 
and crossed the center line of U.S. Highway 90, re sulting in a 20 
head-on collision with Ms. Catalano's vehicle, and 21 
 WHEREAS, officers cited Mr. Burthe with a violation of s. 22 
316.089, Florida Statutes, for failing to use a designated lane 23 
and failing to drive within a single lane, and 24 
 WHEREAS, Ms. Catalano was transported to the emergency 25      
   
CS/HB 6509  	2022 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb6509-01-c1 
Page 2 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
department at Tallahassee Memorial HealthCare, suffering from a 26 
left side rib fracture, left upper arm and forearm open 27 
fracture, a non-displaced fracture of the left leg, an open left 28 
femur distal fracture, distension of the abdomen, tenderness of 29 
the left ribs, and abrasions to the left side of her face, and 30 
 WHEREAS, during the next four days, Ms. Catalano underwent 31 
six surgeries to repair the various injuries suffered as a 32 
result of the vehicular accident caused by Mr. Burthe, and 33 
 WHEREAS, on July 5, 2019, Ms. Catalano was transferred to 34 
the Tallahassee Memorial HealthCare Rehabilitation Center by 35 
ambulance to begin physical therapy for her injuries, staying 36 
there for approximately 3 months until she was discharged in 37 
September 2019 to continue physical therapy at home, and 38 
 WHEREAS, Ms. Catalano now suffers from chronic pain; mental 39 
anguish, stress, and anxiety; stiff, aching knees that require 40 
her to walk with a cane; an inability to straighten or lift her 41 
right arm; and incontinence, and 42 
 WHEREAS, Ms. Catalano can no longer perform traditional 43 
nursing duties as a result of these injuries, and 44 
 WHEREAS, Mr. Burthe, as an employee of the Department of 45 
Agriculture and Consumer Services, acting within the scope of 46 
his employment, owed a duty to Ms. Catalano to conduct himself 47 
in a reasonable manner and exercise reasonable care, but 48 
breached that duty by driving carelessly, and 49 
 WHEREAS, on July 10, 2020, Ms. Catalano filed a lawsuit 50      
   
CS/HB 6509  	2022 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb6509-01-c1 
Page 3 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
against the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to 51 
recover damages as a result of the negligent conduct of the 52 
department's employee, Mr. Burthe, and 53 
 WHEREAS, on July 15, 2021, the Department of Agriculture 54 
and Consumer Services and Ms. Catalano reached a settlement 55 
agreement for $3,375,000, of which $200,000 was paid by the 56 
Division of Risk Management, and 57 
 WHEREAS, the Department of Agriculture and Consumer 58 
Services supports Ms. Catalano's efforts to seek the remainder 59 
of the agreed-upon compensation, and 60 
 WHEREAS, due to the limits of s. 768.28, Florida Statutes, 61 
at the time of the incident, Ms. Catalano has collected only 62 
$200,000 of her settlement agreement with the Department of 63 
Agriculture and Consumer Services, and the remainder may be 64 
recovered only through a claim bill approv ed by the Legislature, 65 
NOW, THEREFORE, 66 
 67 
Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Florida: 68 
 69 
 Section 1.  The facts stated in the preamble to this act 70 
are found and declared to be true. 71 
 Section 2.  The sum of $3,175,000 is appropriated from the 72 
General Inspection Trust Fund to the Department of Agriculture 73 
and Consumer Services for the relief of Donna Catalano for 74 
injuries and damages sustained. 75      
   
CS/HB 6509  	2022 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb6509-01-c1 
Page 4 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 Section 3.  The Chief Financial Officer is directed to draw 76 
a warrant in favor of Donna Catalano in the sum of $3,175,000 77 
upon funds of the Department of Agriculture and Consumer 78 
Services in the State Treasury and to pay the same out of such 79 
funds in the State Treasury. 80 
 Section 4.  The amount paid by the Department of 81 
Agriculture and Consumer Services pursuant to s. 768.28, Florida 82 
Statutes, and the amount awarded under this act are intended to 83 
provide the sole compensation for all present and future claims 84 
arising out of the factual situation described i n this act which 85 
resulted in injuries and damages to Donna Catalano. The total 86 
amount paid for attorney fees relating to this claim may not 87 
exceed $635,000, the total amount paid for lobbying fees may not 88 
exceed $158,750, and the total amount paid for cost s or other 89 
similar expenses may not exceed $29,059.94. 90 
 Section 5.  This act shall take effect upon becoming a law. 91