House | 02/01/2022 | Laid on Table, refer to SB 7000 | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Substituted SB 7000 | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/1/2022) | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Reported out of State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Favorable by State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/18/2022 | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Now in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Reported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Favorable by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 12/03/2021 | Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/03/2021 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 12/03/2021 | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/02/2021 | Filed |