House | 02/09/2022 | Laid on Table, refer to SB 7014 | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Substituted SB 7014 | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/9/2022) | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Reported out of Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Favorable by Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/18/2022 | Now in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/18/2022 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/14/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/14/2022 | Filed |