House | 02/09/2022 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 96, 1st Eng. | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Substituted CS/SB 96, 1st Eng. | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/9/2022) | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | CS Filed | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Reported out of Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Filed |