Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H8063 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/24/2022

                                
   
HR 8063  	2022 
 
 
 
 
hr8063-00 
Page 1 of 3 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
House Resolution 1 
A resolution recognizing March 8, 2022, as 2 
"International Women's Day" in Florida. 3 
 4 
 WHEREAS, International Women's Day is an annual celebration 5 
of women's cultural, educational, economic, political, and 6 
social accomplishments, and recognizes women's achievements 7 
regardless of cultural, economic, ethnic, linguistic, national, 8 
or political divisions, and 9 
 WHEREAS, on February 28, 1909, the first National Women 's 10 
Day was observed in the United States, and 11 
 WHEREAS, on June 26, 1945, the Charter of the United 12 
Nations was signed, marking the first affirmation of equality 13 
between women and men by international agreement, and 14 
 WHEREAS, the United Nations celebrated International 15 
Women's Day for the first time on March 8, 1975, and 2 years 16 
later, declared a day for international peace and women's rights 17 
by resolution in the United Nations General Assembly, and 18 
 WHEREAS, every year, approximately 12 million girls 19 
worldwide are married before they reach the age of 18, and 20 
 WHEREAS, according to the International Labor Organization, 21 
71 percent of the estimated 40.3 million victims of modern 22 
slavery in 2016 were women and girls, and 23      
   
HR 8063  	2022 
 
 
 
 
hr8063-00 
Page 2 of 3 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 WHEREAS, according to UNICEF, an estima ted one out of three 24 
women around the world has experienced some form of physical or 25 
sexual violence, and 26 
 WHEREAS, women also occupy statewide leadership positions 27 
including Lieutenant Governor, Attorney General, and 28 
Commissioner of Agriculture and Consum er Services, and 29 
 WHEREAS, currently, 34 percent of the members of the 30 
Florida Legislature are women, including 40 Representatives and 31 
15 Senators, and 32 
 WHEREAS, in 2021, continuing the tradition of honoring 33 
Florida women, Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Barbara 34 
Nicklaus, and Beverly White Yeager were added to the Florida 35 
Women's Hall of Fame for making significant contributions in the 36 
life of women and residents of Florida, and 37 
 WHEREAS, women, and particularly women of color, who are 38 
more likely to work in businesses deemed to be "essential" and 39 
in the hardest-hit industries, have been disproportionately 40 
affected by the COVID -19 pandemic, and 41 
 WHEREAS, women comprise more than two -thirds of the health 42 
care workforce in the United States, as well as 78 per cent of 43 
the social workers, 53 percent of essential retail workers, and 44 
34 percent of delivery and warehouse employees, putting women in 45 
the frontlines of the pandemic, and 46 
 WHEREAS, the theme of International Women's Day 2022 is 47 
"Break the Bias," NOW, THE REFORE, 48      
   
HR 8063  	2022 
 
 
 
 
hr8063-00 
Page 3 of 3 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 49 
Be It Resolved by the House of Representatives of the State of 50 
Florida: 51 
 52 
 That March 8, 2022, is recognized as "International Women's 53 
Day" in Florida and residents of the state are encouraged to 54 
celebrate the day by honoring the achievements and 55 
accomplishments of women. 56