06/02/2022 | Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 328F) | |||
House | 03/14/2022 | See HB 5001 (line item 328F) | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/08/2022 | Filed |