06/02/2022 | Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 1665A) | |||
House | 03/14/2022 | See HB 5001 (line item 1665A) | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Filed |