|
05/20/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/20/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 35 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (807346)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/21/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/16/22, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Recommendation: Favorable by Special Master on Claim Bills
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2021
|
Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|