Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0080 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill August 2, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2022
Bill January 26, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis January 21, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022