Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 6513
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 6513
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/03/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Favorable by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Now in Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/10/22, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2021
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2021
|
References corrected to Judiciary; Education; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2021
|
Original reference(s)- removed: Special Master on Claim Bills
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2021
|
Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Education; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|