Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0082 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill August 2, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022
Analysis January 7, 2022