|
02/16/2022
|
Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (503145)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 77, NAYS 39
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Amendment 503145 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/1/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Reapportionment read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/19/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
CS by- Reapportionment; YEAS 10 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Reapportionment, 01/13/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/21/2021
|
Referred to Reapportionment
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/17/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|