Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0100 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 17, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 3, 2022

Enrolled

Bill February 3, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 14, 2022