Senate | 03/09/2022 | Ordered enrolled | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022) | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Filed |