Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0144 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022