Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to HB 159
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Substituted HB 159
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/10/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/26/22, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2021
|
Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2021
|
Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 11/02/21, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2021
|
Referred to Regulated Industries; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|