Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0170 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 14, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis November 2, 2021
Analysis November 1, 2021