|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted for HM 1531
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/13/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2021
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2021
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 11/02/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 10/18/21, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2021
|
Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|