Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0174 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 14, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 3, 2022

Analysis

Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis November 3, 2021
Analysis October 15, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill November 3, 2021