Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 95
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 95
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Retained on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
CS/CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
CS/CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/08/22, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
CS by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/10/22, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 11/30/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2021
|
Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|