Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0190 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 14, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022
Analysis November 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 8, 2022
Bill January 11, 2022