Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 105
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 105
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Retained on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 02/07/22, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Now in Environment and Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 11/03/21, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2021
|
Referred to Community Affairs; Environment and Natural Resources; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|