Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0224 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 15, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2022
Bill February 8, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis November 3, 2021
Analysis November 2, 2021