|
06/10/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/09/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2021
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2021
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 12/01/21, 4:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2021
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2021
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/02/21, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|