Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0226 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 25, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis December 2, 2021
Analysis November 30, 2021
Analysis November 2, 2021
Analysis November 1, 2021