|
05/06/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-91
|
|
|
|
05/06/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/03/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (477889)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Amendment 477889 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/25/22, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Banking and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Remaining references corrected to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/11/22, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|