Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0266 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 8, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 11, 2022