Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 395
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 395
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 02/16/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2021
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2021
|
Favorable by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Education, 11/02/21, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2021
|
Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|