Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0268 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis November 2, 2021
Analysis November 1, 2021