House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 28 NAYS 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (349788)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/27/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/20/22, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Remaining references corrected to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/12/22, 9:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2021
|
Referred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|