Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0280 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill January 27, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 21, 2022
Bill January 12, 2022

Analysis

Analysis January 20, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022