Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted for HB 33
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/27/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/18/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2021
|
Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 11/02/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2021
|
Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|