LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0288
Draft Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S0288
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S0288
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
September 22, 2021
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
March 5, 2022
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
January 27, 2022
Analysis
January 25, 2022
Analysis
January 18, 2022
Analysis
January 14, 2022
Analysis
November 3, 2021
Analysis
November 1, 2021