Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 173
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 173
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 02/16/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Favorable by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/18/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2021
|
Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/23/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|