Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0340 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022