Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1521
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 1521
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/22/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
CS by Health Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2021
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/04/2021
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 11/03/21, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2021
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|