Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0358 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022
Bill November 4, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis November 4, 2021
Analysis November 2, 2021