Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to HB 6037
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted HB 6037
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Retained on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/27/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/10/22, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/30/21, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/02/21, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|