Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0360 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022
Analysis January 7, 2022
Analysis November 30, 2021
Analysis November 1, 2021