Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Died on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Retained on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/02/22, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
CS by Transportation read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2021
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2021
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2021
|
CS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 12/01/21, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2021
|
Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|