Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0398 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 4, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022
Bill December 3, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis December 2, 2021
Analysis November 29, 2021