Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted for HB 451
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/27/22, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 01/13/22, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Now in Finance and Tax
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 11/03/21, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2021
|
Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|