LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0406
Draft Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S0406
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S0406
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
October 5, 2021
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
March 5, 2022
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
January 28, 2022
Analysis
January 26, 2022
Analysis
January 13, 2022
Analysis
January 11, 2022
Analysis
November 3, 2021
Analysis
November 2, 2021