|
06/10/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-182
|
|
|
|
06/09/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/03/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted for CS/HB 153
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/27/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/20/22, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/11/22, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2021
|
Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|