Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0430 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2022

Analysis

Analysis January 20, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 12, 2022