|
05/12/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-104
|
|
|
|
05/12/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/05/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted for HB 327
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/27/22, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 01/12/22, 4:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/30/21, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|